Cousin et al v. River West LP

Plaintiff: Becky Cousin and Richard Cousin
Defendant: River West LP
Case Number: 3:2007cv00576
Filed: August 14, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting 60 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/25/2013. (NLT)
May 21, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING : The Court finds by a preponderance of the evidence that the evidence and testimony presented at trial support a total damages award in the amount stated. Judgment in accordance with the foregoing findings of fact andconclusions of law is so ordered. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/21/2013. (LLH)
March 31, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : 45 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED on the issue of liability in accordance with Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and hereby DENIED otherwise. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/31/11. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cousin et al v. River West LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Cousin
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Cousin
Represented By: Martin S. Bohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River West LP
Represented By: Myron A. Walker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?