Carter v. Hubert et al

Plaintiff: Derrick Carter
Defendant: Cornel Hubert, Rayburn Teer, Donald Johnson, Unknown Cochran, Unknown Curtis, Unknown Snowden, Unknown Decuir and Unknown Foster
Case Number: 3:2007cv00614
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: Iberville
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 14, 2011 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 169 Motion for Certificate of Appealability; denying 169 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/14/11. (BP)
February 15, 2011 166 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 163 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Dfts' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be granted and this action shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/15/10. (BP)
May 17, 2010 146 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 144 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 140 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Unknown Curtis shall be granted and the claims against Lt. Curtis shall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. §1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. This matter shall be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on the plaintiff's First Amendment claim against Maj. Donald Johnson, Lt. Patrick Cochran and Maj. Kenneth Stewart. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 5/17/10. (BP, )
June 24, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 87 Motion to Sanction Defendant Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/24/2009. (JDL, )
June 12, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 83 Notice of Compliance filed by defts....Within 10 days from the date of this order counsel for the defts shall file copies of all documents produced in response to the court's initial disclosure order issued 9/18/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 6/12/2009. (JDL, )
February 6, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Pltfs Motion to Compel the Return of Law Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 2/6/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Hubert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derrick Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornel Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayburn Teer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Snowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Decuir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?