Kador et al v. City of New Roads et al

Plaintiff: Donnysius Kador and Donell Francois, Jr.
Defendant: City of New Roads, Kevin McDonald, Harold Terrance, John Boudreaux and Mark Dupont
Case Number: 3:2007cv00682
Filed: September 24, 2007
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 186 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Witness Tampering 170 . Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 9/21/12. (Roaix, Greta)
October 13, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 120 Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff Proposed Expert Dr Belaire. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 10/13/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
June 8, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 85 MOTION for New Trial on Limited Issues filed by Mark Dupont, John Boudreaux, Harold Terrance, 84 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Mark Dupont, John Boudreaux, Harold Terrance, Kevin McDonald, City of New Roads, 97 MOTION to Strike 84 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Alternatively, Opposition to Motion for Attorney's Fees filed by Donell Francois, Jr., Donnysius Kador. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 06/08/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
April 5, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment 70 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 04/05/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
November 9, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that, in connection with the October 20, 2010 Ruling & Order 66 , plaintiffs are entitled to an award of $437.50 in attorneys fees from the defendants and/or their counsel related to the expenses they incurred in r elation to opposing defendants motion to compel 64 . Such award shall be paid to the plaintiffs within sixty (60) days of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants and/or their counsel shall pay the award of $700.00 owed in connection with the Ruling & Order dated June 28, 2010 53 to the plaintiffs within thirty (30) days of this Order.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/9/2010. (CMM)
August 26, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 59 Motion for Contempt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 8/26/2010. (CMM, )
May 27, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 39 Motion and Order for Rule 35 Examination filed by defendants is hereby DENIED AS WRITTEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defense counsel shall consult with plaintiffs counsel and agree upon a mutually con venient date and time for an examination of plaintiff, Donnysius Kador, that Dr. Donald Hoppe, Psy.D, is suitably licensed or certified to conduct. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall submit a revised request for Rule 35 examination to plaint iffs counsel, within fifteen (15) days, which provides all of the details regarding the location and scope of that examination required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 35, as discussed in this Ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 05/27/2010. (NLT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kador et al v. City of New Roads et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnysius Kador
Represented By: Jill Leininger Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donell Francois, Jr.
Represented By: Jill Leininger Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Terrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boudreaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dupont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?