Scott v. Hubert et al

Petitioner: Warren Scott, III
Respondent: Cornel H. Hubert and Charles C. Foti, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, and ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The petitioner's claim that he was denied effective assistance of counsel during his sexual battery trial, when his trial attorney failed to timely make a Batson challenge during jury selection, is denied and this action ishereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 3/27/2013. (PJH)
July 23, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 49 Report and Recommendations that petitioner's claim that his guilty plea to aggravated burglary was not knowing and voluntary is denied.This matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings on petitioner's sexual battery trial ineffective assistance of counsel claim. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 07/23/2012. (KDC)
May 14, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Warren Scott, III...It is recommended that the petitioners application for habeas corpus relief challenging his convictions for unauthorized entry of an inhabited dw elling and aggravated burglary be dismissed, with prejudice, as untimely pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d). It is further recommended that the petitioners application for habeas corpus relief challenging his sexual battery conviction be dismissed, with prejudice, as procedurally barred... Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/14/2009. (NLT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Hubert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Warren Scott, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cornel H. Hubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles C. Foti, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?