Smith v. Hebert et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Defendant: Gabriel Hebert, Kevin Benjamin, M Laborde, C Darbonne, Louis Stood, Rachel Taylor, Bo Whitaker, Chad Hukins, Todd Barrere, David Voorhies, Jr., Burl Cain and Richard Stalder
Case Number: 3:2008cv00030
Filed: January 14, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: Ascension
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 24, 2012 263 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The 262 motion by pltf to file a supplemental objection is GRANTED. The Court approves the 231 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge and adopts it as the Court's opinion herein, and the 208 motion by pltf for summary judgment, is DENIED, and the 191 motion by defts for summary judgment is GRANTED, and this matter shall be dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/23/2012. (JDL)
September 30, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by defendants is granted and plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is denied and this action shall be dismissed.. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/30/11. (PJH)
May 19, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 94 Pltfs Motion to Compel Defts to File an Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/19/2009. (JDL, )
April 27, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 91 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 42 motion to dismiss is granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiff's claims except the plaintiff's equal protection claim against Kevin Benjamin and h is retaliation claims against Michael Laborde, Rachel Taylor, Todd Barrere, David Voorhies, Harold Sterling, James Tillman, Louis Stroud and Irving Stammriech. The court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law and this action is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/24/2009. (NLT, )
March 16, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 42 MOTION to Dismiss by defendants... It is recommended that the 42 motion to dismiss be granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiff's claims except the plaintiff's equal protection claim agains t Kevin Benjamin and his retaliation claims against Michael Laborde, Rachel Taylor, Todd Barrere, David Voorhies, Harold Sterling, James Tillman, Louis Stroud and Irving Stammriech. It is further recommended that the court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law and this action be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings... Objections to R&R due by 3/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/13/2009. (NLT, )
January 7, 2009 79 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 57 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge, The defendant's 41 motion for summary judgment is granted, dismissing the plaintiff's claims that he was subjected to an excessive use of force and that excessive force was applied in retaliation for filing an administrative grievance, for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling them in forma paupers status. Further, this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/7/2009. (NLT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hebert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Hebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Darbonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Stood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bo Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Hukins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Barrere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Voorhies, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?