Broussard et al v. Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of LA, Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kyle Broussard and Gator Tail, L.L.C.
Defendant: Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of LA, Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00124
Filed: February 28, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER: For the reasons set forth, the Court finds that the evidence clearly and convincingly proves: (1) all asserted claims of the patents-in-suit are invalid due to obviousness; (2) United States Patent Number 7,052,340 is invalid due to lack of written description; and (3) Claims 1, 8, and 14 of United States Patent Number 7,052,340 and Claim 1 of the United States Patent Number 7,297,035 are each invalid due to lack of definiteness. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' respective requests for declaratory judgment of invalidity of the asserted claims of the patents-in-suit (08cv-00124 Doc. 22; 08-cv-00125 Doc. 9) are GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs in civil actions 3:08-cv-00124-BAJ-RLB Kyle Broussard, et al. v. Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of La., Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc. and 3:08-cv-00125-BAJ-RLB Gator Tail, et al. v. Mud Buddy, LLC d/b/a Mud Buddy Manufacturing. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/09/2014. (NLT)
June 5, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The parties shall submit briefs on whether the patents-in-suit are void for lack of definiteness no later than 6/13/2014. The Parties' briefs shall be limited to no more than 7 pages, and shall otherwise be in accordance with this Court&# 039;s Local Rules. In addition to addressing whether the patents-in-suit are invalid for lack of definiteness in light of the Supreme Court's Nautilus decision, the Parties' briefs shall address whether Defendants waived the issue of invalidity for lack of definiteness "by failing to properly raise that argument in their post-trial briefs. Brief due by 6/13/2014. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 6/5/2014. (SMG)
January 23, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER granting 99 Motion to Strike. The Clerk of Court shall STRIKE FROM THE RECORD Dr. Garris's Supplemental Expert Report and all exhibits thereto, including the Declaration of Steven Wells. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/23/2014. (SMG)
January 6, 2014 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 91 Motion for Summary Judgment. The 99 Motion to Exclude is denied as moot insofar as they relate to the defendants' motions for summary judgment. The 110 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief Opposing Summary Judgment is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/6/2014. (SMG)
June 25, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The jury shall be instructed in accordance with the Court's foregoing interpretation of the disputed claim terms in the '600,'340, and '035 patents. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 06/25/2013. (CGP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broussard et al v. Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of LA, Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Broussard
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gator Tail, L.L.C.
Represented By: Juston M. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go-Devil Manufacturing Co. of LA, Inc. d/b/a Go-Devil Manufacturers of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?