Sandres v. State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration et al

Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Defendant: State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration and Office of Risk Management
Case Number: 3:2008cv00145
Filed: March 11, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 204 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER denying 195 Petition for Permission To Appeal, 196 Application For Stay Of Judgment Pending Appeal Of Judgment Or As Alternative, A New Trial, Also Stay of Ruling And Order, 197 Motion For A New Trial OrPetition Thereof, and 198 Motion For Separation Of This Case To Serve Justice And To Proceed With Trial. It is FURTHER ORDERED that 203 Motion To Expedite Final Ruling, Order And Judgement On Case # 08-145 / 08-563 Since Your Court Did Not Include Them In The Body Of Last Ruling Of March 19,2013 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 09/11/2013. (NLT)
January 25, 2011 182 Opinion or Order of the Court RULINGS denying 181 Motion for Final Order Concerning Transferring Case and Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 1/25/2011. (JDL)
September 22, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants 141 Motion for Summary Judgment shall be granted in part and denied in part. Defendants motion shall be granted as to the plaintiffs race discrimination and hostile work environment claims. Defendants motion shall be denied as to the plaintiffs retaliation claim.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/22/2010. (CMM, )
August 19, 2010 164 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 161 Motion for Explanation or Time Estimate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/19/2010. (CMM, )
September 24, 2009 146 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The plaintiff has filed a motion claiming the scheduling order was not followed because the defendants did not respond to her settlement offer. While the Court encourages settlement of cases, no party is required to settle a case. The failure or refusal to settle is not a violation of the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/24/09. (BP, )
September 23, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting and Affirming the 8/25/2009 135 Ruling of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the 9/3/2009 136 Decision of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/23/2009. (JDL, )
September 9, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Magistrate Judge's 7/20/2009 125 Ruling is AFFIRMED. Pltfs 128 Request for a Decision, is now moot. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/9/2009. (JDL, )
August 25, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: 130 Pltfs Motion to Compel Subpoenaed Records From MV Tech is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/25/2009. (JDL, )
August 10, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: as to 130 MOTION to Compel filed by Naomi Sandres. Pltf shall have until 8/24/2009 to file a supplemental memorandum in support of her motion to compel discovery, as directed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/10/2009. (JDL, )
July 20, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Pltfs 123 Motion to Cancel Depositions of Mary Ann Christopher, Janette Chriss, Albert Jenkins, Janet London and Margie Washington on 7/28 and 7/29/2009 and to Reschedule on 8/5-6/2009 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/20/2009. (JDL, )
June 4, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 121 MOTION for Further Explanation of Meaning of Document #93 filed by Naomi Sandres. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 6/3/09. (BP, )
May 18, 2009 117 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 116 Motion for Explanation of Meaning of Notations at Bottom of Rulings or Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/18/2009. (JDL, )
April 24, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 109 Motion for Reason Pltf Was Not Entitled to a Warning in Writing of Limited Time to Respond to Defts Motion, to the extent that the explanation has been provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/24/2009. (JDL, )
March 11, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court quashed all subpoenas issued by the pltf. The Court adopts by reference its prior decision rendered on this issue on 2/4/2009. As to the questions in her motion; such a procedure is not permitted under the FRCP. No further response is required by the Court. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 3/11/2009. (JDL, )
February 5, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 58 Defts MOTION to Dismiss and granting 91 Pltfs MOTION to Amend 67 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED paragraphs 11, 12, 66, 67 and 73 of pltfs second amended complaint are dismissed. FURTHER ORDERED that pltfs state law claim involving violation of LA Public Records Act is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/5/2009. (JDL, )
February 4, 2009 94 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 76 Defts Motion to Compel the pltfs deposition. The Court orders that the deposition of Naomi Sandres be taken within 30 days of this ruling. The Court will impose sanctions for failure to comply with his order as allowed under FRCP Rules 26 and 37. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/4/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandres v. State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Sandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Louisiana Division Of Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Risk Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?