Ricard v Cain

Plaintiff: Alfred Ricard, III
Defendant: Burl Cain
Case Number: 3:2008cv00161
Filed: March 17, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: no cause specified
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court Certificate of Appealability Denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/29/2010. (JDL, )
March 23, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The petitioner has failed to respond to the Court's Order 16 , therefore, this proceeding shall be dismissed pursuant to Rose v Lundy, supra, for failure of the petitioner to exhaust state court remedies with regard to all of the claims asserted in his habeas petition. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/23/2010. (JDL, )
February 19, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Petitioner is granted a period of 20 days within which to amend his petition to delete those claims which have not been previously presented to the state court. Further, this matter is referred back to the USMJ for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 2/18/10. (BP, )
December 10, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Alfred Ricard, III. It is recommended that the petitioner be granted a period of 20 days from the date that the District Judge acts upon this Report and Recommendati on within which to amend his petition to delete those claims which have not been previously presented to the state court as stated herein. It further recommended that this matter be referred back for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 12/28/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/10/2009. (CMM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricard v Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Ricard, III
Represented By: John Christopher Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?