Triangle Metals, Inc. v City of Port Allen

Plaintiff: Triangle Metals, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, City of Port Allen, Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc., American Contractors Indemnity Company and Sharon Foreman Lavergne
Case Number: 3:2008cv00205
Filed: April 7, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Taxes Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446 Notice of Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 12, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT: granting 25 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company, United States of America, Sharon Foreman Lavergne, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 11/12/2009. (JDL, )
August 13, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 22 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. IT IS ORDERED that defendant Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc. shall be dismissed from this action since defendant, Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc. was never served in this matter and plaintiff's counsel has informed the Court that American Contractors Indemnity Company is surety for Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 8/12/09. (BP, )
July 27, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding...It is recommended that the deft, Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc. was never served in this matter andpltfs counsel has informed the Court that American Contractors Indemnity Company is surety for Elevated Tank Ap plicators, Inc. and that Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc. should no longer be a deft in this matter, it is hereby recommended that deft Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc.be dismissed from this action.... Objections to R&R due by 8/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 7/27/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Triangle Metals, Inc. v City of Port Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: John Joseph Gaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Port Allen
Represented By: Victor Joseph Woods, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elevated Tank Applicators, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: Denise C. Puente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Foreman Lavergne
Represented By: Thomas W. Acosta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triangle Metals, Inc.
Represented By: J. Mark Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?