Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc. v. JLG Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc.
Defendant: JLG Industries, Inc. and Gradall Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00285
Filed: May 9, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 38 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 25 the Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Clamis for Breach of Contract and/or Breach of Partnership/Joint Venture is denied. Further, the 26 Motion for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim is denied as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/4/2010. (CMM,)
December 21, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims for Breach of Contract and/or Breach of Partnership/Joint Venture filed by JLG Industries, Inc. and Gradall Industries, Inc....It is recommended that the motion should be DENIED...FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Counterclaim filed by JLG Industries, Inc. and Gradall Industries, Inc. should be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 1/7/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 12/21/2009. (JDL, )
March 24, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 20 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the 10 Motion to Disqualify Counsel filed by Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc. is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/23/2009. (JDL, )
March 9, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING & ORDER granting 18 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defts, JLG Industries, Inc. and Gradall Industries, Inc. shall produce complete responses to pltfs Amended Requests for Production within 20 days of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that pltf is e ntitled to an award of reasonable attorney's fees and costs incurred in bringing this motion and that, in connection with that award, the parties shall follow the instructions in the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/9/2009. (JDL, )
February 12, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 10 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel filed by Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc....It is recommended that the motion should be denied... Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/12/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc. v. JLG Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrara Fire Apparatus, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Henchy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLG Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Paul Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gradall Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brent Paul Frederick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?