Diez Oil Company, Inc. v. Exxon Mobil Corporation

Plaintiff: Diez Oil Company, Inc.
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00316
Filed: May 23, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Exxon Mobil Corporation. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/27/09. (BP, )
February 17, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge as to 9 Motion for Dismissal and Motion to Remand filed by Diez Oil Company, Inc. Accordingly, the pltfs motion, considered solely as a motion to remand, is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/17/2009. (JDL, )
January 26, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 9 MOTION to Dismiss and Remand filed by Diez Oil Company, Inc....It is recommended that the motion considered solely as a motion to remand, be denied... Objections to R&R due by 2/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/26/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diez Oil Company, Inc. v. Exxon Mobil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diez Oil Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Ryland Percy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corporation
Represented By: Carey L. Menasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?