Walker v. Stewart et al

Plaintiff: Calvin Walker
Defendant: Kenneth Stewart, Willie Kelly, Janice Immasche and Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Case Number: 3:2008cv00324
Filed: May 28, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Kenneth Stewart, 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Calvin Walker, 31 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. It is ordered that the parties' cross motions for summary judgment be denied and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings.. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 10/8/09. (LSM, )
September 18, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Kenneth Stewart, 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Calvin Walker...It is recommended that the parties cross motions for summary judgment be denied... Objections to R&R due by 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/17/09. (LSM, )
January 15, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION granting in part and denying in part 17 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 16 Defts Motion to Dismiss shall be GRANTED in part, dismissing pltfs unconstitutional conditions of confinement and medical indifference cl aims and his claims against Hunt Correctional Center. In all other respects, the defts motion shall be DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter shall be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings on the pltfs excessive force claims against Maj. Kenneth Stewart. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/15/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice Immasche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elayn Hunt Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?