Fraiche et al v. Sonitrol Corporation

Plaintiff: John Fraiche and Donna D. Fraiche
Defendant: Sonitrol Corporation
Case Number: 3:2008cv00392
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING the Court hereby denies plaintiffs' 107 Motion for Reconsideration of Its February 9, 2009 Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Strike as to Sally Wright's deposition testimony and supporting documents. The Court also instructs the parties to submit additional motions to clarify on what issues Connor provide expert testimony.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/28/2011. (PJH)
February 9, 2011 105 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court denies 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to pltfs gross negligence claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/28/2011. (JDL)
November 19, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Pltfs Motion to Compel. FURTHER ORDERED that deft shall supplement its responses to the three discovery requests within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/18/2010. (JDL)
March 31, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: As to 61 Defts MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines related to expert discovery. Sonitrol has 10 days from the date of this order, or until 4/12/2010, to file its brief outlining the discovery sought and citing specific authority sup porting its position that the discovery sought is relevant to pltfs breach of contract and/or gross negligence claims and/or defts defenses to pltfs claims. Thereafter, pltfs have 5 days, or until 4/19/2010, to file a response, citing specific supporting authority for their position. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/31/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fraiche et al v. Sonitrol Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fraiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna D. Fraiche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonitrol Corporation
Represented By: Betty Burke Uzee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?