Sterling v. City of New Roads et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Sterling
Defendant: City of New Roads and Clarendon America Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2008cv00424
Filed: July 9, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 15, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that final judgment be entered in favor of defendants, City of New Roads, Columbia Casualty Company, and Clarendon America Insurance Company, and against Plaintiff, Kevin Sterling. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/15/2010. (CMM,)
January 6, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Columbia Casualty Company, City of New Roads. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/6/2010. (LSM, )
February 23, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Clarendon America Insurance Company and the claims against Clarendon America Insurance Company are dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/23/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sterling v. City of New Roads et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sterling
Represented By: Roderick Terrell Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarendon America Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?