Norman v. Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Theoshamond Norman
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Clyde Spain, R Guillory and John Does
Case Number: 3:2008cv00449
Filed: July 18, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Iberville
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 MOTION to Rescind Consent to Proceed only to the extent that any consent executed and mailed prior to the date of this order, even though not yet received by the court, is null and void, and upon receipt shall be returned to the plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/26/11. (BP)
March 27, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 22 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Clyde Spain, Department of Public Safety and Corrections is granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against the Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections. In all other respects, the defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby denied and this matter is referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/27/09. (BP, )
March 4, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clyde Spain, Department of Public Safety and Corrections. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants' motion to dismiss be granted in part, dismissing the plaintiffs claims against the Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections. In all other respects, the defendants' motion to dismiss should be denied and this matter be referred back to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 3/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 3/4/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norman v. Department of Public Safety and Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theoshamond Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?