The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Robinson-Downs et al

Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Beverly Robinson-Downs, Alice Downs, Southern Memorial Gardens, Ford Acceptance Corporation, Hall Davis & Son Funeral Service, Ltd and C&J Financial, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant: Southern University and A & M College, Betty Hodge and Lester Pouriciau
ThirdParty Plaintiff: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Cross Claimant: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Cross Defendant: Alice Downs
Counter Claimant: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Counter Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2008cv00528
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Robert S Carr
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 106 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alice Downs, 109 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Gwendolyn Jase Robinson. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 11/23/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
March 24, 2011 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING AND JUDGMENT granting 81 Motion for Attorney Fees. Judgment is rendered in favor of Prudential and against defendants for attorney fees in the amount of $6,262.11. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 03/24/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
February 14, 2011 93 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 77 Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 02/14/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Robinson-Downs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Memorial Gardens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Acceptance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall Davis & Son Funeral Service, Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&J Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Southern University and A & M College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Betty Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty defendant: Lester Pouriciau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty plaintiff: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Alice Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Beverly Robinson-Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?