Dykes, Jr. et al v. Maverick Motion Picture Group, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Jay Dykes, Jr. and Dykes and Dykes, L.L.C.
Defendant: Maverick Motion Picture Group, L.L.C., Maverick Films, L.L.C., Ironstar, L.L.C., Mark Morgan, Tara Pirnia, Austen Tayler, Guy Oseary and Madonna Louise Ciccone
Case Number: 3:2008cv00536
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that plaintiff shall be awarded reasonable expenses in the amount of $5,060.00, for the filing of both the motion to compel and the motion for sanctions, and Maverick shall pay this amount within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on August 11, 2011. (LMS)
March 14, 2011 138 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 104 Deft Guy Oseary's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and granting Deft Madonna Louise Ciccione's 105 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/14/2011. (JDL)
January 14, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Pltfs Motion to Compel, as stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/13/2011. (JDL)
January 10, 2011 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Jay Dykes, Jr. against Maverick Motion Picture Group, L.L.C. in the amount of $737,000 and for 5% of Maverick Motion Picture Group's adjusted gross profits from The Stanford Prison Experiment, if the film is ever produced in the future, in addition to pre-judgment and post-judgment interest as stated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/7/2011. (JDL)
October 20, 2010 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 98 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash. The motion for protective order regarding the depositions of Madonna and Oseary is GRANTED; The motion to quash the deposition of Emery is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction; and In all other respects, the motion is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 10/20/10. (BP, )
September 8, 2010 96 Opinion or Order of the Court Response to dft's Sur-Reply Memo in Opposition to 75 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages filed by Dykes and Dykes, L.L.C., Jay Dykes, Jr.. (BP, ) Modified on 9/9/2010 to edit document type (BP, ).
July 26, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 69 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 33 Motion for Default Judgment, filed by Jay Dykes, Jr., Dykes and Dykes, L.L.C. is granted in part and denied in part as stated herein. Cnsl for plas shall submit a form of judgment in accordance herewith. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 23/10. (BP, )
September 18, 2009 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motions for Protective Order 39 & 41 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART in that pltfs have 60 days or until 11/18/2009, to conduct the jurisdictional discovery outlined in their supplemental memorandum and as further limited above and as stated herein. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss 21 & 40 are DISMISSED, without prejudice to defts to refile after the completion of the limited jurisdictional discovery discussed above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/17/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dykes, Jr. et al v. Maverick Motion Picture Group, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Dykes, Jr.
Represented By: Robert L. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dykes and Dykes, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert L. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Motion Picture Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maverick Films, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironstar, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Pirnia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austen Tayler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Oseary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madonna Louise Ciccone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?