Marks v Louisiana Association of Educators

Plaintiff: Jessica Marks
Defendant: Louisiana Association of Educators
Case Number: 3:2008cv00573
Filed: September 11, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 19, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING On Motion for Summary Judgment granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant, dismissing this action. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 8/18/2011. (PJH)
May 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 7 Motion to Remand filed by Jessica Marks is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/1/2009. (NLT, )
March 31, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 7 MOTION to Remand filed by Jessica Marks...It is recommended that the Motion to Remand filed by plaintiff, Jessica Marks, be DENIED.... Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 3/31/2009. (NLT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v Louisiana Association of Educators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Marks
Represented By: Richard G. Creed, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Association of Educators
Represented By: Scott D. Huffstetler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?