Johnson v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Walter Johnson
Defendant: N. Burl Cain, Joe Lamartiniere, Tim Delaney, Preseley Bordenlon, Larry Douglas and Angola Boxing Assoc.
Case Number: 3:2008cv00590
Filed: September 17, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2011 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 65 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and 60 , 63 pltfs motions for summary judgment shall be DENIED, defts 59 motion for summary judgment shall be GRANTED and this action shall be DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 2/9/2011. (JDL)
January 12, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 41 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 33 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Walter E. Johnson, Jr. shall be denied and this action shall be referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 1/12/10. (BP, )
December 17, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Walter E. Johnson, Jr. It is recommended that the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be denied, and that this action be referred back for further proceedings. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 12/16/09. (BP, )
September 30, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION Adopting 35 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pla's claims asserted against dfts Tim Delaney and the Angola Boxing Association shall be dismissed for failure to serve these dfts within 120 days as mandated by FR CP Rule 4(m). Further ordered that the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over all state law claims and that the Motion to Dismiss of the remaining dfts shall be granted in part, dismissing the pla's claims asserted against dft Burl Cain and dismissing the pla's claim that dfts Joe Lamartiniere and Preseley Bordenlon were deliberately indifferent to pla's safety and well-being by failing to control or segregate a co-inmate who they knew posed an unreasonable dang er to the physical safety of other prisoners. Further ordered that the state law claims shall be dismissed without prejudice. Further ordered that this action be referred back for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Frank J. Polozola on 9/30/09. (BP, )
September 3, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joe Lamartiniere, N. Burl Cain, Larry Douglas, Preseley Bordenlon...It is recommended that the pltfs claims asserted against defts Tim Delaney and the Angola Boxing Association be d ismissed for failure to serve these defts within 120 days as mandated by FRCP Rule 4(m). It is further recommended that Court decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and that the Motion to Dismiss of the remaining defts be granted in part, dis missing the pltfs claims asserted against deft Burl Cain and dismissing the pltfs claim that defts Joe Lamartiniere and Preseley Bordenlon were deliberately indifferent to pltfs safety and well-being by failing to control or segregate a co-inmate who they knew posed an unreasonable danger to the physical safety of other prisoners, and that this action be referred back for further proceedings... Objections to R&R due by 9/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 9/3/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Delaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preseley Bordenlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Douglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angola Boxing Assoc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?