Harris v. Joiner et al

Plaintiff: Reginald E Harris
Defendant: James Jim Joiner, Three Unknown Baton Rouge City Police Officers, Baton Rouge City Police Department and United States Army National Guard
Case Number: 3:2008cv00614
Filed: October 1, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 6, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT....It is ordered that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendants, Three Unknown Baton Rouge City Police Officers, Baton Rouge City Police Department, United States Army National Guard, James Joiner, and the City of Baton Rouge, and against the plaintiff, Reginald E. Harris, and this action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/6/2010. (LSM, )
December 15, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Reginald E Harris...It is recommended that the plaintiffs claims against defendants Three Unknown Baton Rouge City Police Officers, Baton Rouge City Police Department, and United States Army National Guard be dismissed for failure to serve the defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m).2 It is further recommended that the plaintiffs claims against defendants James Joiner and the City of Baton Rouge be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 41.3M.... Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/14/09. (LSM, )
January 15, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Compel Service of Process. The USM serve deft United States Army National Guard as provided by Rule 4(i). Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/15/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Joiner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald E Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jim Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Unknown Baton Rouge City Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baton Rouge City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army National Guard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?