Williams v. Hinyard et al

Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Defendant: Eric Hinyard, Juan Conrad, Kevin Smith and Willie Dickens
Case Number: 3:2008cv00656
Filed: October 15, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Compel. Within 14 days the defendants shall serve a supplemental response to requests for production of documents numbers 3, 4, 9 and 10. In all other respects, the plaintiffs motion is denied, the parties shall bear their respective costs incurred in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/3/2011. (LSM)
May 1, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 17 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Juan Conrad, Eric Hinyard, Willie Dickens is granted and this action is dismissed pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B) (ii). Further, the claims against deft Sgt. Kevin Smith are dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/1/09. (BP, ) Modified on 5/1/2009 to edit text (BP, ).
April 13, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Juan Conrad, Eric Hinyard, Willie Dickens...It is recommended that the motion for summary judgment be granted and this action be dismissed pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). It is further recommended that the claims against deft Sgt. Kevin Smith be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m)... Objections to R&R due by 4/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/13/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hinyard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Hinyard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Dickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?