Advocate Financial, LLC v. Kent Mercier et al

Plaintiff: Advocate Financial, LLC
Defendant: Kent Mercier and Mercier Law Offices
Case Number: 3:2008cv00696
Filed: October 29, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Negotiable Instrument Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of pla and against dfts as stated herein. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/2/09. (BP, )
August 12, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 109 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Judgment filed by Advocate Financial, LLC. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/12/09. (BP, )
August 3, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 107 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/31/2009. (JDL, )
January 23, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR WRIT OF SEQUESTRATION: Document #13 be stricken from the record. FURTHER ORDERED that a writ of sequestration be issued by the Clerk and served by the USM on Kent Mercier, the Mercier Law Firm, etc. (certifed copy sent to USM). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/23/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advocate Financial, LLC v. Kent Mercier et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advocate Financial, LLC
Represented By: James Conner Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kent Mercier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercier Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?