Ratcliff v. MedSouth Record Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Susan Ratcliff
Defendant: MedSouth Record Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00718
Filed: November 4, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 79 Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Counter Claim. FURTHER ORDER denying 77 MOTION for Leave to Amend Counter Claim. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/20/2012. (tsf)
October 5, 2011 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 56 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 56 Motion to Dismiss; and denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/5/2011. (CAA)
May 28, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 8 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 2 the Motion Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3) and Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §14 06(a) (R. Doc. 2) filed by defendant, MedSouth Records Management, LLC, is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/27/09. (BP, )
February 12, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 2 MOTION to Transfer Case to USDC Eastern District filed by MedSouth Record Management, LLC. It is recommended that the Motion Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(3) and Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1406(a) (R. Doc. 2) filed by defendant, MedSouth Records Management, LLC, should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 2/12/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. MedSouth Record Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ratcliff
Represented By: Andrew Wallace Eversberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedSouth Record Management, LLC
Represented By: Gary M. Zwain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?