Hodge v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al

Plaintiff: Donald C Hodge
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office and Louisiana State University Board of Supervisors
Case Number: 3:2008cv00735
Filed: November 10, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Tort Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office, The Board of Supervisors for Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College, Greg Phares, Leonardo Deon Moore against Donald C. Hodge, Jr. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/5/10. (BP, )
May 19, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 11 Motion for Rule 54(b) Certification. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 5/19/2009. (JDL, )
March 25, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by The Board of Supervisors for Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College and the 3 Notice of Exception of Lack of Procedural Capacity and No Cause of Action filed by East Baton R ouge Parish Sheriff's Office. The Board's request for attorney's fees is DENIED at this time for lack of adequate factual and legal foundation. Pltf may amend his complaint by 5/31/2009 to state a cognizable claim against Lt. Moore and/or the Sheriff of EBRP. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/24/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodge v. East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald C Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Baton Rouge Parish Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Tara Lynn Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State University Board of Supervisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?