Bray v. Strategic Restaurants, et al

Plaintiff: Harrison R. Bray
Defendant: Strategic Restaurants and AIG Domestic Claims, Inc
Case Number: 3:2008cv00767
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defts 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and Defts 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/30/2010. (JDL, ) Modified on 3/31/2010 to mark as a written opinion (DQA, ).
February 5, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 38 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs 35 MOTION to Remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/4/2010. (JDL, )
December 30, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 35 MOTION to Remand filed by Harrison R. Bray. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the plaintiff's Motion to Remand be denied. Objections to R&R due by 1/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/30/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bray v. Strategic Restaurants, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison R. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Restaurants
Represented By: Christian B. Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIG Domestic Claims, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?