Washington v. Cain et al

Petitioner: Edward Washington
Respondent: Burl Cain and James D. Caldwell
Case Number: 3:2008cv00769
Filed: November 25, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 44 Motion. The petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment, rec.doc.no. 44, be and it is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/19/2012. (CGP)
June 23, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 30 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus shall be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/23/10. (BP, )
July 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is hereby deemed timely-filed and the State of Louisiana is directed to file a brief responding to the merits of petitioner's habeas application. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/30/09. (BP, )
June 8, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edward Washington. It is recommended that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be deemed timely-filed and that the State of Louisiana be directed to file a brief responding to the merits of petitioner's habeas application. Objections to R&R due by 6/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 6/8/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James D. Caldwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?