Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Community Health Center, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company, Allstate Indemnity Company, Allstate Property and Casualty Company, Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company and Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Community Health Center, Inc., Community Health & Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Kathy Hampton, Leon Hampton and Mid City Imaging
Case Number: 3:2008cv00810
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2014 458 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION: ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs on plaintiffs' claims for fraud, misrepresentation, and unjust enrichment. FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendants on defendants' counterclaims. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 04/28/2014. (kac)
September 27, 2013 427 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS ruling on objections to exhibits as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 09/27/2013. (kac)
May 7, 2013 356 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 278 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 316 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 05/07/2013. (kac)
September 17, 2012 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS: ORDERED that Counsel for defendants shall show cause in writing and before 9/18/2012, at noon, why he has not complied with the filing deadlines set forth in the Courts minute entry 191 . Counsel for defendants shall advise the Co urt in writing and no later than 9/18/2012, at noon, whether defendants oppose plaintiffs motion for leave to file amended pretrial order as set forth in document 190 . By 9/18/2012, at noon, counsel for defendants shall file a memorandum regarding its proposed proof as set forth in document 199 . By 9/18/2012, at noon, counsel for all parties shall file memoranda as set forth in document 193 . By 9/19/2012, at noon, counsel for plaintiffs shall file a specification as set forth in document. By that same time, counsel shall confer as to the possibility of expediting trial by using affidavits and/or stipulations as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 9/17/12. (PLH)
June 20, 2012 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 92 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 6/20/2012. (KAC)
May 25, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS denying 86 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Community Health & Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Community Health Center, Inc., Kathy Hampton, Leon Hampton, Mid City Imaging filed by Kathy Hampton, Community Health & Rehabilitation Center, Inc., Mid City Imaging, Leon Hampton, Community Health Center, Inc. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 5/25/12. (PLH)
April 3, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER & REASONS re: 42 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines MOTION Modify Scheduling Order, or case is Complex, 38 MOTION to Strike Reconventional Demand. ORDERED that the 38 MOTION to Strike Reconventional Demand is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the 42 MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines MOTION Modify Scheduling Order, or case is Complex is DENIED. Signed by Judge Helen Ginger Berrigan on 4/2/12. (PLH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company et al v. Community Health Center, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher E. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Christopher E. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Christopher E. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher E. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate County Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher E. Lawler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health & Rehabilitation Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid City Imaging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?