Smith v. Harris et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00010
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 18, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 45 MOTION to Correct a Clerical Mistake as Under Federal Rule Civil Procedure 60(a) and denying 44 MOTION to Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 2/17/10. (BP, )
February 3, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of dfts R.G. Harris, Larry Caldwell M.D., Manzoor Shah M.D., Stephanie Slaughter R.N. and Unknown Thomas R.N. and against plaintiff and this action is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/3/10. (BP, )
January 6, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Frank Charles Smith, Jr, 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephanie Slaughter, Manzoor Shah, R.G. Harris. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that th e plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be denied, that the defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted and the claims against Dr. Larry Caldwell be dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) and this action be dismissed. It is further recommended that the claims against Ms. Thomas, R.N. be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 4 (m), Fed. R.Civ. P. Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 1/6/10. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?