Johnson v. Prince et al

Plaintiff: Emmitt Johnson
Defendant: Howard Prince, Andrew Childs and Donald Johnson
Case Number: 3:2009cv00025
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Iberville
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT...It is ordered adjudged and decreed that the defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted and judgment is entered for defendant, Lt. Donald Johnson and against plaintiff, Emmitt Johnson. All other pending motions in this action are hereby dismissed, as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/16/2010. (LSM, )
January 7, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Donald Johnson...It is recommended that the Defts motion for summary judgment be granted and this action be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 1/25/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 1/7/2010. (JDL, )
November 2, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying as moot 30 Pltfs Motion to Stay Ruling on Deft Johnson Summary Judgment Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/2/2009. (JDL, )
June 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 23 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Childs, Donald Johnson, Howard Prince, is granted in part, dismissing all of the pltfs claims except his claim that Lt. Johnson used excessive force against him on 10/24/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/5/2009. (JDL, )
April 23, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Andrew Childs, Donald Johnson, Howard Prince. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the defendants' motion for summary judgment be granted in part, dismissing all of the plaintiffs claims except his claim that Lt. Johnson used excessive force against him on October 24, 2008. Objections to R&R due by 5/7/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 4/23/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Prince et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmitt Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Childs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?