Anderson v. State of Louisiana, et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Anderson
Defendant: State of Louisiana, James M. LeBlanc, Burl Cain, Richard L. Peabody and Yusuf Abdullah
Case Number: 3:2009cv00075
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and Order granting in part and denying in part 26 MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order and to Amend the Complaint.. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/8/2010. (CMM,)
June 21, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 42 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 26 Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Amend the Complaint is granted in part, such that the Complaint be amended to assert the claim stated in paragraphs 36 through 40 of the proposed Amended Complaint regarding an alleged state-wide policy with response to the Nation of Islam, and denied in all other respects. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/18/10. (BP, )
April 23, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING : The court DISMISSES plaintiff's § 1983 claim against the State of Louisiana through the DPSC. In all other respects, the court DENIES the defendants' 13 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/23/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. State of Louisiana, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard L. Peabody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yusuf Abdullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Anderson
Represented By: Katharine Murphy Schwartzmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?