Hongo v. Adams et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie K. Hongo
Defendant: Unknown Adams, Unknown Dupuy, Unknown Smith, Unknown Williams, Unknown Vittorio, Unknown Boaker and Unknown Ladd
Case Number: 3:2009cv00122
Filed: March 3, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 28 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 25 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and the defts 24 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and this case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/8/2012. (JDL)
January 7, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiff's claims against defendants Capt. Smith, Capt. Williams and Dr. Ladd are DISMISSED for failure to serve the defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/7/2010. (CMM,)
December 15, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS... It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the plaintiff's claims against defendants Capt. Smith, Capt. Williams and Dr. Ladd be dismissed for failure to serve the defendants pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P. Objections to R&R due by 1/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/14/2009. (CMM,)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hongo v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie K. Hongo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Dupuy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Vittorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Boaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Ladd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?