Lewis v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Sugar Ray Lewis
Defendant: Burl Cain, Carlos Pennywell and Clarence Harris
Case Number: 3:2009cv00126
Filed: March 5, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 18 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 11 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sugar Ray Lewis is DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/8/2009. (NLT, )
August 20, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 11 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sugar Ray Lewis...It is recommended that the pltfs cross motion for summary judgment be denied, without prejudice... Objections to R&R due by 9/3/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/20/2009. (JDL, )
June 15, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 12 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 10 Defts motion to dismiss is GRANTED and the claims against him are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 6/11/2009. (JDL, )
May 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Burl Cain...It is recommended that the defts motion to dismiss be granted and the claims against him be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 5/26/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sugar Ray Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Pennywell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarence Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?