Courville et al v. National Freight, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Ronald T. Courville, Sr., Deborah L. Courville and Ronald T. Courville, Jr.
Defendant: National Freight, Inc., Richard A. Boss and XYZ Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00136
Filed: March 11, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: East Baton Rouge
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2012 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 186 Motion in Limine to Exclude MikeEnglands Testimony. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/20/2012. (GBW)
June 1, 2011 132 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 96 Motion for Sanctions; denying 100 Motion for Taxation of Costs. ; denying 100 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 06/01/11. (PAH)
May 9, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 124 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiffs' 111 Motion to Remand is denied.. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 5/9/2011. (CMM)
October 12, 2010 102 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING 84 National Freight, Inc.'s and Richard Boss' Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued to Rair Technologies, LLC and for Protective Order and Costs is granted in part and denied in part, as stated. Defts request for an award of costs is also denied. The parties shall bear their respective costs incurred in connection with this motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 10/8/2010. (JDL, )
September 14, 2010 93 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Motions to Dismiss 61 &[ 73] filed by Defendants, Medero Medical of Orange South, L.L.C., Dr. Edward Demmi, and Dr. Carol Grant, are GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/14/2010. (JDL, )
March 23, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defts 26 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment regarding Punitive Damages is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 3/22/2010. (JDL, )
September 23, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The ruling on 14 Pltfs Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Deadlines is deferred until after the court rules on pltfs motion to compel discovery. The parties are strongly encouraged to proceed with their discovery, including identification of expert witnesses, to the extent they can do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/23/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Courville et al v. National Freight, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald T. Courville, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah L. Courville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald T. Courville, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Boss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?