Carrollton Presbyterian Church v. Presbytery of South Louisiana

Plaintiff: Carrollton Presbyterian Church
Defendant: Presbytery of South Louisiana
Case Number: 3:2009cv00138
Filed: March 12, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 12 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. 4 Motion to Remand filed by Carrollton Presbyterian Church is granted in part and denied in part. The motion to remand is granted and this matter shall be remanded to the 19th JDC and the motion is denied insofar as the pla sought an award of costs and expenses. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/3/09. (BP, )
April 9, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The TRO is extended through the time of 11:59 p.m. on the tenth calendar day after the date on which the decision on Pla's Motion to Remand is entered by the court. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 4/9/09. (BP, )
March 27, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 4 MOTION to Remand filed by Carrollton Presbyterian Church. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the Motion to Remand and Request for Attorneys Fees and Costs filed by plaintiff Carrollton Presb yterian Church be granted in part. The motion should be granted insofar as the plaintiff sought an order remanding this case to the state court. The motion should be denied insofar as the plaintiff sought an award of costs and expenses incurred in connection with the motion. Objections to R&R due by 4/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 3/27/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrollton Presbyterian Church v. Presbytery of South Louisiana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrollton Presbyterian Church
Represented By: Lloyd Joseph Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presbytery of South Louisiana
Represented By: John Anthony Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?