Burnett et al v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company

Plaintiff: Phillip Burnett and Allison Burnett
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2009cv00166
Filed: March 25, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Frank J. Polozola
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and denying as moot 61 Motion for Oral Argument. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 05/14/2012. (NLT) Modified on 5/14/2012 (NLT).
March 28, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 43 Motion for Certification of Interlocutory Appeal. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/28/2012. (CMM)
March 5, 2012 42 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration of 37 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Phillip Burnett, Allison Burnett. State Farm is granted leave to file a separate motion for partial summary judgment on the sole of the remaining tort claim. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/5/2012. (LSM)
November 22, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/21/2011. (CMM) Modified on 11/22/2011 to edit text. (CMM)
November 4, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Motion in Limine; denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court grants dft 10 days to amend its answer to include the affirmative defense of exclusion. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/3/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnett et al v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Company
Represented By: Henry Gerard Terhoeve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?