Johnson v. Lamartiniere et al

Plaintiff: Walter Edward Johnson, Jr
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere, J. Bolden and K. Davis
Case Number: 3:2009cv00176
Filed: March 30, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: West Feliciana
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 9, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING 14 Pltfs motion for new trial pursuant to Rule 59(a) is denied. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 7/9/2009. (JDL, )
June 26, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 5 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs complaint, as amended, shall be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/26/2009. (JDL, )
June 23, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 5 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge, the pltfs complaint shall be DISMISSED pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 6/23/2009. (JDL, )
May 27, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Walter Edward Johnson, Jr...It is recommended that the Pltf's complaint be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)... Objections to R&R due by 6/10/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 5/27/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lamartiniere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Edward Johnson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Lamartiniere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bolden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?