Slaughter v. Atkins et al

Plaintiff: Ralph Slaughter
Defendant: Dale Atkins, Johnny Anderson, Tony Clayton and Lea Polk-Montgomery
Case Number: 3:2009cv00190
Filed: April 3, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2018 259 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING setting forth reasons for granting 248 MOTION for Summary Judgment Based on Res Judicata. Slaughter's remaining claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote on 1/22/2018. (Whidden, Corey)
September 24, 2014 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 235 Motion to Stay Proceedings. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote on 09/24/2014. (Williams, Lysandra)
September 16, 2014 237 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING granting 160 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 161 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 181 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 182 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Atkins and Anderson are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E. Foote on 09/16/2014. (Williams, Lysandra)
September 21, 2010 158 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Defendants Atkins' and Anderson's Motions for Summary Judgment 14 & 16 be DENIED insofar as they seek dismissal of plaintiff's claims by reason of res judicata. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Atkins' and Anders on's Motions for Summary Judgment 14 & 16 be DENIED insofar as they seek dismissal of plaintiff's § 1983 claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Atkins' and Anderson's Motions for Summary Judgment 14 & 16 be GRANTED insofar as they seek dismissal of plaintiff's § 1985, intentional infliction of emotional distress, and abuse of rights claims. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 9/21/2010. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Atkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lea Polk-Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Slaughter
Represented By: Jill L. Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?