Brown v. Cain et al

Case Number: 3:2009cv00196
Filed: April 7, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) filed by Sgt. Brian Sharp is GRANTED. Further, the claims against Sgt. Adams are DISMISSED for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 4(m) and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/1/2010. (JDL, )
February 5, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 21 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. Rule Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Unknown Sharp. It is the recommendation of the magistrate judge that the Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b) filed by Sgt. Brian Sharp be granted. It is further recommended that the claims against Sgt. Adams be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Rule 4(m), Fed.R.Civ.P., and that this action be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 2/22/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/5/10. (BP, )
October 13, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge regarding the 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Burl Cain. Defts motion to dismiss is GRANTED and the claims against Warden Burl Cain are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 10/13/2009. (JDL, )
August 21, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Burl Cain...It is recommended that the defts motion to dismiss be granted and the claims against Warden Burl Cain be dismissed... Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/21/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?