Smith v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Defendant: Burl Cain, Richard Stalder, James LeBlanc, John Robson and Kevin Benjamin
Case Number: 3:2009cv00322
Filed: May 29, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 127 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 123 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs 37 Motion to Withdraw and/or to Reinstate Case is DENIED and this action is terminated on the Docket of the Court. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/14/2012. (JDL)
March 9, 2012 76 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 75 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The 43 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and this matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for an evidentiary hearing on the 37 Motion to Withdraw Settlement and/or Reinstate Lawsuit filed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/8/2012. (LSM)
July 22, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 48 Motion to Expand Discovery and 50 Motion for Additional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 7/21/2011. (JDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Stalder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Robson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?