Franklin v. Cain

Plaintiff: Dolan Franklin
Defendant: Burl Cain, Unknown Calvert, Lucinda Unknown, Unknown Norman, Unknown Stagg and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2009cv00397
Filed: July 8, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 14 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal pursuant to 28 USC 1915 is DENIED. Further pursuant to 28 USC 1 915(a)(3) and FRAP 24(a)(3), the court ce rtify that the appeal is not taken in good faith for the reasons set forth in the magistrate judge's report. If the appellant moves to proceed on appeal IFP, the clerk shall mail a copy of this ruling to the inmate accounting office. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/2/2009. (NLT, )
September 1, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 4 Report and Recommendations and 7 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge and this matter is dismissed is frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/31/09. (BP, ) Modified on 9/1/2009 to edit text (BP, ).
August 3, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 5 Amended Complaint filed by Dolan Franklin...It is recommended that the Pltfs complaint, as amended, be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)... Objections to R&R due by 8/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/3/2009. (JDL, )
July 22, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Dolan Franklin...It is recommended that the Pltf's complaint be dismissed as frivolous pursuant to 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)... Objections to R&R due by 8/5/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/22/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Franklin v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolan Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?