Lewis et al v. Jindal et al

Plaintiff: Brian Lewis and Diana Lewis
Defendant: Bobby Jindal, Kip Holden and Office of the Parish Attorney
Case Number: 3:2009cv00405
Filed: June 26, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of dfts and against plas and this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/24/09. (BP, )
September 4, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Diana Lewis, Brian Lewis...It is recommended that the pltf's complaint be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous... Objections to R&R due by 9/21/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 9/3/2009. (JDL, )
September 2, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of dfts and against plas and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 9/2/09. (BP, )
July 31, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Diana Lewis, Brian Lewis...It is recommended that the pltfs complaint be dismissed with prejudice as frivolous. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 7/31/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Jindal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jindal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kip Holden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Parish Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?