Rue v. Adams

Petitioner: Zachary Wayne Rue
Respondent: Henry Adams
Case Number: 3:2009cv00413
Filed: July 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 29, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 15 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rule 41.3M. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 4/28/10. (BP, )
June 30, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 . FURTHER ORDERED that the Title 42 U.S.C. § 1983 complaint filed by Zachary Wayne Rue is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 6/26/2009.(mmm, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2009.]
June 3, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Zachary Wayne Rue, 1 Complaint filed by Zachary Wayne Rue recommending that the captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to the USDC Middle Dist of LA Objections to R&R due by 6/17/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/3/09.(bbc, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 7/1/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rue v. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Zachary Wayne Rue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Henry Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?