Miller v. Cain et al

Plaintiff: Dale R. Miller
Defendant: Burl Cain, Chad Oubre and Unknown McDowell
Case Number: 3:2009cv00416
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Feliciana
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 13 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The pltfs complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling them in forma pauperis status. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/31/2009. (JDL, )
August 4, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Dale R. Miller...It is recommended that the pltf's complaint be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 USC 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling them in forma pauperis status. Objections to R&R due by 8/18/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 8/4/2009. (JDL, )
July 28, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 3 Pltfs Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Emergency Injunction. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/28/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Cain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?