Johnson v. Cain et at

Plaintiff: David Scott Johnson
Defendant: Burl Cain
Case Number: 3:2009cv00454
Filed: July 15, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Christine Noland
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2014 157 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING and ORDER denying 156 Motion for Relief Pursuant to Rule 60(b) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Request for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 5/12/2014. (SMG)
September 7, 2012 148 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: A review of the record shows that the plaintiff failed to pay the filing fee. Therefore, the plaintiffs § 1983 complaint shall be dismissed without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/6/12. (DCB)
July 12, 2012 141 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The parties cross-motions for summary judgment (docs. 119and 132) are DENIED, and this matter is referred back to the United StatesMagistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/12/2012. (PJH)
June 17, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Stay such that the defendants are hereby directed to respond to the plaintiffs request for production of documents filed in January, 2011, with the additional caveat that the defendants are not required to provide to th e plaintiff a copy of the transcript of his deposition conducted on December 8, 2010 and denying 70 MOTION for Leave to File Second Request for Production of Documents and denying 73 Motion to Compel filed by David Scott Johnson,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 06/17/11. (PAH). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 06/17/11. (PAH)
September 7, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: Accordingly, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over plaintiff's state law claims, and plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 29 is hereby DENIED. Defendants' motions to dismiss and for partial summary judgment 15 & 19 , respectively) are hereby GRANTED insofar as they seek dismissal of the claims asserted against defendants, Burl Cain, Joe Lamartinere, Marcus Callahan, and Troy Poret, with prejudice, and DENIED only insofar as they seek dismiss al of plaintiff's excessive force claim against defendant, Antonio Whitaker in his individual capacity. Plaintiff's motion to stay defendant's motion to dismiss 24 is hereby DENIED as moot, and IT IS ORDERED that this matter is hereby referred back for further proceedings consistent with this ruling. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 9/7/2010. (CMM, )
November 18, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel and denying 11 Motion for Appointment of Investigative Expert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 11/18/09. (LSM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Cain et at
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Scott Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burl Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?