Brown v. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Sheroll Brown
Defendant: Michael Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2009cv00487
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and REASONS granting in part 19 Motion for Attorney Fees in that the Commissioner be ordered to pay attorney's fees to Pltf, in the amount of $2,947.50. Signed by Judge Carl J. Barbier on 02/07/11. (PAH)
November 22, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court Order adopting 16 Report and Recommendations of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. The plaintiff's case is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the Court's opinion. Signed by Judge Carl J. Barbier on 11/22/2010. (NLT)
November 1, 2010 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint filed by Sheroll Brown. It is recommended that plaintiffs case be remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings consistent with the Courts opinion. Objections to R&R due by 11/18/2010. Signed by Mag. Judge Alma Chasez on 11/01/10. (PAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheroll Brown
Represented By: Paul Brian Spurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Astrue, Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?