West v. State of Louisiana, Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Harold West, Sr.
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Corrections, Beauregard Torres, III, Paul Perkins and Norman Gremillion
Case Number: 3:2009cv00564
Filed: August 1, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Referring Judge: Docia L Dalby
Presiding Judge: Ralph E. Tyson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2013 171 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING AND ORDER granting 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. West's claims against Louisiana Workforce are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Chief Judge Brian A. Jackson on 11/13/2013. (LLH)
July 28, 2011 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING granting 48 MOTION to Stay Cross-Claim and Compel Arbitration by Louisiana Workforce, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order, # 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay Cross Claim and Compel Arbitration. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 7/27/2011. (CMM)
July 18, 2011 53 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 28 , 29 , and 39 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge. The 20 Motion to Dismiss filed by Norman Gremillion is denied and the 13 Motion to Dismiss filed by Paul Perkins is granted in part and denied in part. The court hereby declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiff's state law claims. Signed by Judge Brian A. Jackson on 07/17/2011. (NLT)
November 12, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion to Vacate 2 30 Day Stay Order. (Copy sent to William Kline) Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/10/2009. (JDL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. State of Louisiana, Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold West, Sr.
Represented By: Alfreda Tillman Bester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauregard Torres, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?