Landry et al v. Laney Directional Drilling Co. et al

Plaintiff: Chad Landry and Jeanne Burns
Defendant: Laney Directional Drilling Co. and State of Louisiana, Department of Environmental Quality
Case Number: 3:2009cv00615
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: Iberville
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: John V. Parker
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 54 MEMORANDUM RULING. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 07/28/2010. (Williams, Lysandra)
July 19, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING: The court finds that defendants motion for summary judgment, doc 34 , should be GRANTED and that Ibervilles motion to intervene, doc 35 should be DENIED. The court will issue judgment in conformity with these findings. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 07/19/2010. (Williams, Lysandra)
November 16, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court RULINGS AND ORDER : 8 MOTION to Remand filed by Jeanne Burns, Chad Landry is hereby Denied. 7 MOTION to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(6) filed by State of Louisiana is hereby Granted and the claims against dft Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality shall be dismissed. Signed by Judge John V. Parker on 11/16/09. (BP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landry et al v. Laney Directional Drilling Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laney Directional Drilling Co.
Represented By: Phillip Wade DeVilbiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana, Department of Environmental Quality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?