Pittle et al v. McGlynn et al

Plaintiff: Ralph D. Pittle and Medical Legal Consultants of Washington, PLSC
Defendant: Daniel McGlynn, Christopher D. Glission, Karl Koch, The Law Firm of McGlynn, Glisson & Koch, The Law Firm of McGlynn, Glisson & Mouton and Benjamin P. Mouton
Case Number: 3:2009cv00620
Filed: August 7, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 2, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: The Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion (doc. 90) on the issue of formation of a contract and DENIES on the issue of breach and damages. The Court GRANTS Defendants Summary Judgment on the issue of consequential damages. Defendants motion for summary judgment on their September 1, 2011 counterclaim is DENIED. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 09/01/2011. (NLT)
December 1, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on 67 Motion for Ralph D. Pittle to Enroll and to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion is granted in part. Ralph D. Pittle is admitted pro hac vice as additional counsel for plaintiff Medical Legal Consultants of Washington, PLSC. The motion is denied insofar as Ralph D. Pittle also sought to enroll as additional counsel on his own behalf, appearing pro se. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 12/1/2010. (JDL)
August 11, 2010 62 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Defts 50 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in part, as it relates to pltfs contract claims, and GRANTED in part, as it relates to pltfs fraud and punitive damages claims. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 8/10/2010. (JDL, )
March 19, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting 44 Report and Recommendations, of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the plaintiffs' claims against defendants Christopher D. Glisson, Karl Koch and Benjamin Mouton are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m). Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/18/2010. (CMM,)
February 10, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 1 Complaint, filed by Ralph D. Pittle, Medical Legal Consultants of Washington, PLSC...It is recommended that the plaintiff's claims be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m)... Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 2/10/2010. (LSM, )
August 7, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/6/2009; 9 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction SUSTAINED, the Court will transfer plaintiff's action to the Middle District of Louisiana. cc:counsel, USDC ED/LA (TLB)[Transferred from Kentucky Western on 8/7/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittle et al v. McGlynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph D. Pittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Legal Consultants of Washington, PLSC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel McGlynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher D. Glission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of McGlynn, Glisson & Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of McGlynn, Glisson & Mouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin P. Mouton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?