Georgetown v. Rader et al

Petitioner: Walter R. Georgetown
Respondent: Warden Rader, Lane Thomas, John Bell and Miss Garrig
Case Number: 3:2009cv00634
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Adopting the report and recommendation of the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Accordingly, the defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to exhaust available administrative remedies pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1997e(a), and with prejudice to refiling the claims in forma pauperis status. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 12/17/09. (LSM, )
August 11, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 4 . Case transferred to Middle District of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Ivan L. R. Lemelle.(gec, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2009.]
July 31, 2009 4 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Walter R. Georgetown. Objections to R&R due by 8/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III.(ecm, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/13/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgetown v. Rader et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Walter R. Georgetown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Rader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lane Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Miss Garrig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?