Johnson v. Maestri Murrell Property Management et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Johnson
Defendant: Maestri Murrell Property Management and Azalea Point Apartments
Case Number: 3:2009cv00638
Filed: August 12, 2009
Court: Louisiana Middle District Court
Office: Baton Rouge Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: James J. Brady
Referring Judge: Stephen C. Riedlinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 145 Motion to Compeal (sic) Discovery for Trial Purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 03/05/2015. (BCL)
November 14, 2012 104 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING regarding 37 MOTION to Strike Or Alternatively, Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Calling Counsel As A Witness at Trial filed by Maestri Murrell Property Management, 96 MOTION for Reconsideration of 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Maestri Murrell Property Management, 100 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 11 filed by Kimberly M. Johnson. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 11/14/2012. (Williams, Lysandra)
August 29, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 41 Motion for Summary Judgment, 37 MOTION to Strike Or Alternatively, Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff From Calling Counsel As A Witness at Trial. Signed by Honorable James T. Trimble, Jr on 08/29/2011. (Williams, Lysandra)
November 17, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 18 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Riedlinger on 11/17/10. (BP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Maestri Murrell Property Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly M. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maestri Murrell Property Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azalea Point Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?